skip to content

Bandsma, Robertus Hermanus Johannes

CPSO#: 89609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Groningen, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology, Hepat
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 309057 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: van den Heuvel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bandsma ( CPSO# 89609 )
Dr. M. van den Heuvel ( CPSO# 92573 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's School Clinic
440 Shuter Street
Toronto ON  M5A 1X6

Business Address:
722-115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 743-7520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Dec 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Robertus Hermanus Johannes Bandsma may practise medicine only,

(i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology, Hepatology and Nutrition,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Bandsma holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
(ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bandsma no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.