skip to content

Banayan, Charleen

CPSO#: 91303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
P.O. Box 6664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544 Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLEEN BANAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012