skip to content

Banack, Alan David

CPSO#: 21990

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan D. Banack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St, North York, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1 888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018