skip to content

Bamaga, Ahmed Khamis A

CPSO#: 94919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2011 to 22 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020