Baluch, Narges (CPSO#: 100058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of PEDIATRICS
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6000
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARGES BALUCH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BALUCH is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BALUCH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BALUCH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BALUCH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BALUCH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BALUCH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 14 Apr 2013
PEAP - Resident - Urology

University of Toronto, 15 Apr 2013 to 01 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 19 Sep 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 09 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019