skip to content

Baltzer, Heather Lucretia

CPSO#: 90765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
2 East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5449
Fax: 416-603-5251 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Heather Lucretia Baltzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Baltzer ( CPSO# 90765 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
422 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5449


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER LUCRETIA BALTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALTZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015