skip to content

Balsys, Aras Jonas

CPSO#: 24016

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aras Balsys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: North Park Clinic D2 - 2355 Keele St Toronto, ON M6M 4A2 OR Steeles Midland Medical Centre 4779 Steeles Ave. E. Toronto, ON M9V 4S5 OR Toronto Chronic Diseases Centre 210 - 2330 Kennedy Rd. Scarborough, ON M1T 0A2
Date Received: 08 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: February 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please see February 13, 2017, undertaking attached.
Download Full Document (PDF)