skip to content

Balmain, Sean

CPSO#: 94423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Suite 18-364
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7613
Fax: (416) 586-4775 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West, Suite 500
Toronto, ON, M5M 1C7
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: 416-781-9500
Fax: 416-781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sean Balmain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balmain ( CPSO# 94423 )

Business Address:
MS Cardiology Services
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7

Business Address:
UHN Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Unit 18-364
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:20 Jun 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Sep 2010 to 17 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 18 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019 Active
             Dr. Sean Balmain may practise medicine independently in cardiology.