skip to content

Ballut, Kareem M

CPSO#: 96215

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Washington
1959 NE Pacific St.
Box 356422
Seattle, Washington
Seattle WA  98195-6422
United States
Phone: (206) 778-2529

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kareem M. Ballut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREEM M BALLUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016