skip to content

Ballantine, Michael James

CPSO#: 95267

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Street Medical
770 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 2X4
Phone: (226) 396-1030
Fax: (519) 371-8708 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 - 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K1S4
Canada
Phone: 5193715769
Fax: 5193718708
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

South Bruce Grey Health Centre
Kincardine Site
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z1G6
Canada
Phone: 519 396 3331
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Ballantine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ballantine ( CPSO# 95267 )

Business Address:
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Business Address:
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S3
Phone Number: (519) 371-5769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES BALLANTINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLANTINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013