skip to content

Ball, Daniel Glen

CPSO#: 21979

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel G. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre 50 College Drive North Bay P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017