skip to content

Ball, Christopher Glen

CPSO#: 98398

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Wollongong, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4100 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GLEN BALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017