skip to content

Balit, Corrine Rita

CPSO#: 96394

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2016