skip to content

Baldwin, Corisande Saskia Melody

CPSO#: 96669

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
EL - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015