skip to content

Takhar, Baldeep

CPSO#: 82048

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Oct 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Manchester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone: (519) 620-7044 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Takhar ( CPSO# 82048 )

Business Address:
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: (519) 620-7044


Corporation Name: Dr. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. B. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Takhar ( CPSO# 82048 )

Business Address:
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: (519) 620-7044

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 May 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 May 2019 Active
             As from 12:00 p.m., May 27, 2019, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Baldeep Takhar:

            (i)   Dr. Takhar shall attend the entirety of Pri-Med Canada, or the College of
                  Family Physicians of Canada's Family Medicine Forum, or another similar
                  family medicine program or conference acceptable to the College. Dr.
                  Takhar shall complete this requirement within seven (7) months of the
                  date of this Order or, if no such program or conference is available
                  within that time, as soon thereafter as one is available. Dr. Takhar
                  shall provide proof of her attendance to the College within one (1) month
                  of completion, including the number of credits received;

            (ii)  Dr. Takhar shall attend and successfully complete the course, "Effective
                  Team Interactions," offered by SAEGIS. Dr. Takhar shall complete this
                  requirement within six (6) months of the date of this Order and shall
                  provide her certificate of attendance to the College within one (1) month
                  of completion, including the number of credits received. If the program
                  is unavailable within that time, Dr. Takhar may fulfill this requirement
                  by completing another program related to this topic acceptable to the
                  College within the same time period and forthwith providing proof of
                  completion to the College;

            (iii) Dr. Takhar shall participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics
                  & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for
                  Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to
                  the College regarding Dr. Takhar's progress and compliance. Dr. Takhar
                  shall complete this requirement within six (6) months of the date of this
                  Order;

            (iv)  Within approximately twelve (12) months of the date of this Order, Dr.
                  Takhar shall submit to an assessment of her family medicine practice by
                  an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessment").  The
                  Assessment may include chart reviews, direct observation of Dr. Takhar's
                  care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                  and any other tools deemed necessary by the Assessor.  The results of the
                  Assessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of
                  further action by the College; and

            (v)   Dr. Takhar shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 May 2019
Summary:

1 
  
 On May 24, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baldeep Takhar committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
  
Dr. Baldeep Takhar is a 52 year-old family physician who received her certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the 
College”) in November 2004. At the relevant time, Dr. Takhar practised family medicine in 
Cambridge and Kitchener, Ontario. Dr. Takhar also maintained a cosmetic medicine practice 
which is not the subject of this matter. 
  
 FACTS 
  
 In November 2013, Dr. Takhar, along with three other doctors, created the Franklin 
 Family Health Organization (“FHO”). Dr. Takhar assumed the role of “Lead FHO 
 Physician.” Dr. Takhar had previously been a signatory member at another FHO, the 
 Canamera FHO, since 2011. 
  
 Between December 2013 and December 2015, the practices of Dr. Takhar and the Associate 
 Lead Physician, Dr. Jodie Wang, grew quickly. The Franklin FHO’s total patient 
 enrolment count grew from 8,774 to 18,123 patients. Patients were rostered under 
 approximately seven member physicians, but some member physicians left the FHO and most 
 patients came to be rostered under Dr. Takhar or Dr. Wang. During this time period, Dr. 
 Takhar’s individual patient enrolment count increased from 4,453 patients to 7,282 patients. 
  
 Dr. Takhar practised at two locations of the Franklin FHO in Kitchener, and at one 
location in Cambridge. A further location opened in Guelph in 2014, which was run by two 
other member physicians. 
 
The FHO was staffed by both signatory physicians (who were members of the FHO) and 
 locum physicians who were paid by the hour, as well as other staff such as physician 
 assistants, nurse practitioners, registered practical nurses, and office staff. 
  
 Patients enrolled with the Franklin FHO were rostered to an individual physician. However, 
the Franklin FHO used a “shared care model”, in which each patient could book an 
appointment to see any of the physicians on staff or walk in on the weekend to do so. The 
 rapid growth of the Franklin FHO and the problems that arose in implementing the 
“shared care model” contributed to Dr. Takhar’s failure to maintain the standard of practice of 
 the profession, as outlined below. 
  
 After receiving information of concern regarding Dr. Takhar’s clinical and administrative 
 practices, the College commenced an investigation into her family practice in September 
 2014. An expert was retained who reviewed twenty-two family practice charts and related 
 records, and interviewed Dr. Takhar. The College expert opined in reports in March and 
 October 2016 that Dr. Takhar had failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
 with respect to record keeping, practice management, and clinical management of patients. 
  
                                       2 
  
 In the period reviewed by Dr. Cohen (i.e. 2005 through January 2015), Dr. Takhar failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession as set out below. 
  
 In terms of clinic management, Dr. Takhar rostered too many patients at the Franklin FHO and 
 personally to herself, without ensuring that continuity of care could be provided to rostered 
 patients. 
  
 The Franklin FHO used an electronic medical records system (“EMR”). However, the system in 
 place for physicians to be alerted as to test results or possible charting errors did not reliably 
 reflect whether a result entered into the system had been reviewed by a physician, whether a 
 patient had taken a test that had been ordered, or whether a test result was lost. There was no 
 clear policy or procedure administratively on who should receive this information or follow up 
 in this regard. It was also difficult to determine who was the “most responsible physician” for 
 the patient. This resulted in inconsistent follow-up, and in necessary follow-up sometimes being 
missed. 
 
In terms of medical record keeping, issues were identified with Dr. Takhar’s charting 
practices in a number of the charts reviewed: 
 
-  Information was missing in the comprehensive patient profiles of patients rostered to her, 
   including regarding social history, past medical history, preventive health history, and 
   immunizations; 
-  Progress notes were frequently incomplete or vague as to history, physical examination, 
   diagnosis, plan, and follow-up; 
-  Patient charts lacked appropriate diabetes care documentation regarding a diabetic 
   patient and a potentially diabetic patient whose care was reviewed; and 
-  The patient charts did not document the clinical indication for tests Dr. Takhar ordered or 
   medications she prescribed. 
 
In terms of clinical care, following review of the patient charts from this same period, the 
College’s expert opined that Dr. Takhar’s clinical care of patients did not meet the standard 
of practice of the profession in the following ways: 
 
-  Letters referring patients to specialists for consultation did not set out all the necessary 
   clinical details; 
-  Follow-up on test results for rostered patients and patients for whom she had ordered tests 
   was inconsistent, and necessary follow-up was sometimes delayed or missed; 
-  Follow-up for her patients regarding recommended preventive healthcare was inconsistent, 
   including for Pap smears, mammograms, faecal occult blood tests, and immunizations; 
-  Vitamin B12 injections were given without documented clinical indication, and the chart 
   did not indicate why oral B12 had not been given instead; 
-  Testing was ordered that appeared to be excessive and lacking documented clinical 
   indication in some cases, including blood work and ECHO cardiograms; 
-  Necessary physical examinations were not always documented; 
-  Follow-up for patients with hypertension was sometimes not carried out; 
                                      3 
 
-  Antibiotics were prescribed to some patients without noting clinical indication in the chart, 
   and in one instance there was no indication why primary care guidelines were not followed 
   regarding otitis media (ear infection) in children; and 
-  Medications were prescribed to some patients without noting a clear clinical indication in the 
   chart. 
 
DISPOSITION 
 
On May 27, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
   -     Dr. Takhar attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -     The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Takhar’s 
         certificate of registration: 
         -  Dr. Takhar shall attend the entirety of Pri-Med Canada, or the College of Family 
            Physicians of Canada’s Family Medicine Forum, or another similar family 
            medicine program or conference acceptable to the College. Dr. Takhar shall 
            complete this requirement within seven (7) months of the date of this Order or, if 
            no such program or conference is available within that time, as soon thereafter as 
            one is available. Dr. Takhar shall provide proof of her attendance to the College 
            within one (1) month of completion, including the number of credits received; 
         -  Dr. Takhar shall attend and successfully complete the course, “Effective Team 
            Interactions,” offered by SAEGIS. Dr. Takhar shall complete this requirement 
            within six (6) months of the date of this Order and shall provide her certificate of 
            attendance to the College within one (1) month of completion, including the 
            number of credits received. If the program is unavailable within that time, Dr. 
            Takhar may fulfill this requirement by completing another program related to this 
            topic acceptable to the College within the same time period and forthwith 
            providing proof of completion to the College; 
         -  Dr. Takhar shall participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics & 
            Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for 
            Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to the 
            College regarding Dr. Takhar’s progress and compliance. Dr. Takhar shall 
            complete this requirement within six (6) months of the date of this Order; 
         -  Within approximately twelve (12) months of the date of this Order, Dr. Takhar 
            shall submit to an assessment of her family medicine practice by an assessor or 
            assessors selected by the College (the “Assessment”).  The Assessment may 
            include chart reviews, direct observation of Dr. Takhar’s care, interviews with 
            colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed 
            necessary by the Assessor.  The results of the Assessment will be reported to the 
            College and may form the basis of further action by the College; and 
         -  Dr. Takhar shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
            implementing the terms of this Order. 
   -     Dr. Takhar pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days 
        of the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 24, 2019 at 1:00 p.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Baldeep Takhar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 18, 2018:

Dr. Takhar is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Takhar can practice at only a single practice location, of which she must advise the College.

Dr. Takhar must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.