skip to content

Balakrishnan, Sadhana Lakshmi

CPSO#: 90200

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WestOak Medical Clinic
2525 Old Bronte Road Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-7533
Fax: (905) 582-0766 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sadhana Balakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balakrishnan ( CPSO# 90200 )

Business Address:
WestOak Medical Clinic
Suite 200
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Business Address:
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone Number: (416) 642-9445

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SADHANA LAKSHMI BALAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012