Balaban, Dahlia Yosefa (CPSO#: 100954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3292 Bayview Avenue Suite 306
North York, ON
M2M 4J5
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 225-8499
Fax: (416) 225-1089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dahlia Balaban Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Balaban ( CPSO# 100954)

Business Address:
3292 Bayview Avenue
Suite 306
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 225-8499

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAHLIA YOSEFA BALABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALABAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015