skip to content

Bakovic, Linda Janina

CPSO#: 97305

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Paediatrics
104-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B0A1
Phone: (807) 766-3370 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Linda Bakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bakovic ( CPSO# 97305 )

Business Address:
104-1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 766-3370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDA JANINA BAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
EL - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 15 Nov 2013
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014