skip to content

Bakker, Guusje Willemien

CPSO#: 29503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Willemien Bakker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bakker ( CPSO# 29503 )

Business Address:
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone Number: (905) 279-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 2021