skip to content

Bakkar, Mohammed Mosa M

CPSO#: 98913

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015