skip to content

Bakhsh, Abeer Mohammadidrees A

CPSO#: 94929

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Apr 2011 to 14 Apr 2011
PEAP - R - Cardiology

McMaster University, 15 Apr 2011 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 09 Oct 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 08 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015