Bakheet, Majid Farraj H (CPSO#: 99091)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 23 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016