skip to content

Baker, Robert Steven

CPSO#: 28945

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Nov 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 1983