skip to content

Baker, Blair Albert

CPSO#: 89912

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: 905-878-2383 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Lockport Way
Stoney Creek ON  L8E0H0
Canada
Phone: 905-643-5050
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Blair Albert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Baker ( CPSO# 89912 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 6H7
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BLAIR ALBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010