skip to content

Bakanisi, Balisi Galani

CPSO#: 92685

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Zulu

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of General Surgery
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Botswana
New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BALISI GALANI BAKANISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKANISI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2010 to 20 Jul 2010
PEAP - R - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2010 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2018