skip to content

Bajwa, Sameea Fawad

CPSO#: 95303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Norwegian, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Sciences,Debrecen, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Jones street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sameea Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bajwa ( CPSO# 95303 )

Business Address:
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMEEA FAWAD BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014