skip to content

Bajwa, Riffet Rehana

CPSO#: 87783

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 25, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Riffet Rehana Bajwa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 25, 2015.

Dr. Riffet Rehana Bajwa was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. In the face of these allegations, and as a result of Dr. Bajwa’s health issues that prevented a discipline hearing from taking place, Dr. Bajwa resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)