skip to content

Bajaj, Harminder Pal Singh

CPSO#: 92566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Government Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 497-8558
Fax: 905-497-8559 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Canada
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.P. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bajaj ( CPSO# 92566 )

Business Address:
312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 458-7377

Business Address:
106 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020 Active
 Dr. Harminder Pal Singh Bajaj may practice medicine independently in:

                  (i) primary care, excluding pediatrics, obstetrics and gynecology; and
                  (ii) adult chronic pain management.