skip to content

Baird, Wycliffe Hobart

CPSO#: 24565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
High Point Medical Centre
303 - 3461 Dixie Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3X4
Phone: (905) 625-0889
Fax: (905) 625-9702 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 9, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 15, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Wycliffe H. Baird's privileges were suspended, effective July 9, 2014. On September 11, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College of the termination of the suspension consequent to Dr. Baird's retirement and relinquishment of privileges, effective September 10, 2014.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Nov 2020 Active
 (1 of 2)

As from November 13, 2020, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. WYCLIFFE HOBART BAIRD 
("Dr. Baird")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.

"Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.

"Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.

"Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and links to the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B")

"Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, with a link to the current regulatory list attached hereto at Schedule "C".	

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Baird, certificate of registration number 24565, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that following an investigation about my standard of practice in prescribing, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in prescribing.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	I, Dr. Baird, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Cannabis, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs, in the form attached as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

(i)	the date of the appointment;

(ii)	the name of the patient and chart/file number;

(iii)	the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;

(iv)	the clinical indication;

(v)	whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 

(vi)	Dr. Baird's signature;

(vii)	the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set out below); and

(viii)	the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out below).

(6)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for cannabis and for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.

(7)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "E", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "F";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, monthly for three (3) months;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts selected from the Log at every meeting, or if there are not fifteen charts, review every patient encounter in the Log since the last meeting;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit a written report to the College at the end of three (3) months.

(c)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "F", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor  dated June 23, 2020 and August 10, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "E" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to ensure that Appendix "E" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "E" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease to prescribe Cannabis, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that if I am required to cease to prescribe as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(8)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "F", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection and discussion with Clinical Supervisor:

1.	Cannabis for Medical Purposes, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Cannabis-for-Medical-Purposes

2.	2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain, Michael G. DeGroote National Pain Centre: http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html

(ii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to complete this requirement within two months.

(9)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above and Appendix "E" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (8) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(10)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Baird, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "G" and Appendix "H", respectively. 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(11)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(12)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(13)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(14)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(15)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(16)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(17)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following an investigation about my standard of practice in prescribing, Dr. Baird underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Baird will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 

Dr. Baird will engage in professional education in:

1.	 Cannabis for Medical Purposes; and

2.	Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain

Dr. Baird 's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

(c)	I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(18)	I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20)	I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "E" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
(2 of 2) 

As from July 8, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. WYCLIFFE HOBART BAIRD
                                          ("Dr. Baird")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
                                                     
"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
                  
"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
(2)   I, Dr. Baird, certificate of registration number 24565, am a member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

B.    UNDERTAKING

(3)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 
                  
(4)   Practice Restriction

(a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease to engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine.
                                          
(5)   Clinical Supervision 

(a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)"), for at least six months in duration ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
(i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix "B";
                  
(ii)  Review at least fifteen to twenty (15-20) of my patient charts once every month;
                  
(iii) Meet with me once every month;
                  
(iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
(v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
(vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                  
(vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every three months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                                                
(c)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the medical inspector dated March 26, 2016 and June 13, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
(e)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
(f)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
                  
(g)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
(h)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
                  
(6)   Reassessment of Practice

(a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Baird, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to me.
                  
(e)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, following the decision referenced in section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
(f)   I, Dr. Baird, hereby consent to any of the following being included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the Code: 
                  
(i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms, conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
(ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
(7)   Monitoring 

(a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to inform the College of each and every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
(8)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(11)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(13)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time of Supervision and Re-assessment of his practice:

 Dr. Baird will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                        
Dr. Baird's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
(14)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Baird does not practice Emergency Medicine. 
                  
D.    CONSENT

(15)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my compliance with this undertaking and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A";
                  
(c)   relevant to the Reassessment; and
                  
(d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.


Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Oct 2017
Summary:

On October 16, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and in that 
he has engaged in a conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Baird is a general practitioner who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in Ontario in 1972. At. the relevant time, Dr. Baird practised Emergency 
Medicine at Trillium Health Partners (“the Hospital”), in Mississauga, Ontario.  
 
Patient A: Dr. Baird’s Comments of a Sexual Nature 
 
In May 2011, Patient A attended the Hospital’s emergency department in respect of a knee 
injury, sustained after falling off of her motorcycle. Mr. X, who was with Patient A at the time of 
her injury, attended at the Hospital with her. Patient A was provided with a hospital gown and 
removed her pants, so that her injury could be assessed by Dr. Baird.  
 
When Patient A asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to stand on the leg, Dr. Baird 
responded that she could stand on the leg at whatever point she was able to handle the pain. 
Patient A then asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to ride her motorcycle. Dr. Baird looked 
at Mr. X and stated words to the effect of: “he looks like a motorcycle, you could ride him.”  
 
Patient A was shocked and offended by this comment, which she perceived as sexual 
harassment. She promptly complained to the Hospital.  
 
When Dr. Baird was advised of the complaint, he expressed regret for his actions and remorse 
that the patient had been emotionally injured by the encounter. Dr. Baird agreed to write a letter 
of apology to the patient, including an assurance to the patient that as a result of this interaction 
being brought forward, he would change his behaviour.  
 
The letter of apology was not sent to Patient A. Instead, the Hospital attempted to arrange a 
meeting between Patient A and Dr. Baird.  However, Patient A rejected the invitation to meet 
with Dr. Baird.  
 
Nurse A: Dr. Baird’s Inappropriate Comments 
 
During an evening shift on April 29, 2012, Dr. Baird was the attending Emergency Room doctor. 
Nurse A was standing at the nursing station together with her co-workers when Dr. Baird was 
speaking to a patient and providing indirect instructions to the nursing staff. 
 
When the patient had left, Dr. Baird asked the nursing staff whether the instructions were 
understood. Nurse A jokingly stated that she did not understand. Dr.  Baird turned around in his 
chair to face Nurse A, patted his knees and said: “Nurse A come and sit on my lap so that I can 
spank you.” This comment was made in front of the nursing staff and two patients. Nurse A and 
her nursing colleagues then left the area.  
 
Nurse A was upset and offended as a result of Dr. Baird’s comments. At the end of the shift, 
Nurse A informed Dr. Baird that she felt uncomfortable, embarrassed and insulted by his 
comments. Dr. Baird apologized and stated that it should be taken as a joke. Nurse A filed a 
formal complaint against Dr. Baird.   
 
As a result of the complaint, Dr. Baird agreed to provide a formal letter of apology and to seek 
professional coaching with respect to eliminating inappropriate comments in the workplace, 
demonstrating professional conduct and developing a sense of empathy in order to understand 
how his comments can impact others.  
 
Dr. Baird successfully completed the professional coaching. 
 
Disposition 
 
On November 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-   The Registrar suspend Dr. Baird’s certificate of registration for a period of two months, to 
    commence thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. 
-   The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Baird’s 
    certificate of registration: 
     -  Dr. Baird successfully complete individualized (one-on-one) instruction in medical 
        ethics, with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense and provide 
        proof of completion to the College prior to his resumption of practice. 
-   Dr. Baird reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the program 
    required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
    security acceptable to the College, within thirty days of the date of this Order, in the 
    amount of $16,060.00. 
-   Dr. Baird appear before the panel to be reprimanded within sixty (60) days of this Order. 
-   Dr. Baird pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
    this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 16, 2017

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 May 1990
Summary:

 In May 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Baird guilty of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation 
 to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 27(27); and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Baird's 
 licence to practice medicine be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 18 Jun 1991
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jan 1990

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 13, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 13, 2020:

Following an investigation about my standard of practice in prescribing, Dr. Baird underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Baird will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Baird will engage in professional education in:

1. Cannabis for Medical Purposes; and

2. Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain

Dr. Baird ’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2016:

• Dr. Baird does not practice Emergency Medicine.
Download Full Document (PDF)