skip to content

Bains, Rajdeep Inder

CPSO#: 89498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3176 Ridgeway Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 5S6
Phone: 905 820 3176
Fax: 289 429 0121 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 11
1107 lorne park road
Mississauga ON  L5H 3A1
Canada
Phone: 905 271 5717
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bains Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bains ( CPSO# 89498 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
875 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 3Z3
Phone Number: (905) 875-0955

Business Address:
58-3176 Ridgeway Dr
Mississauga ON  L5L 5S6
Phone Number: 905 820 3176

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJDEEP INDER BAINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011