skip to content

Baillie, Frank George

CPSO#: 28960

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Glasgow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department Of Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 577-9966 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

258 Northshore Boulevard West
Burlington ON  L7T 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 407-2184
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

JOSEPH BRANT HOSPITAL
1245 LAKESHORE RD.,
BURLINGTON
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3730
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007
Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 Mar 2020 Active
             As from March 1, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frank George Baillie
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baillie to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. FRANK GEORGE BAILLIE
                                          ("Dr. Baillie")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Baillie, certificate of registration number 28960, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that concerns had been identified in my
                  general surgery consultation practice at the time of my retirement.   

            (3)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that I currently practise only as a surgical
                  assistant and only at Hamilton Health Sciences (HHS) and Joseph Brant
                  Hospital (JBH).  Accordingly, I have agreed to voluntarily restrict my
                  practice as set out in this Undertaking.

            (4)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that I signed an Undertaking with the College
                  on December 28, 2019 (the "2019 Undertaking") and agree that this
                  Undertaking replaces the 2019 Undertaking.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective March 1, 2020. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon: 
                  
                              a.    who is certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at HHS or JBH, or another Practice
                                    Location as may be approved by the College,
                  
                                    (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (6)(a) above.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake that I will not commence surgical
                        assisting at any other Practice Location (other than HHS and JBH)
                        without prior approval of the College. Should I seek privileges to
                        perform surgical assisting at any other Practice Location, I shall
                        advise the College within five (5) days of making such application,
                        and shall seek approval to practise at the Practice Location at
                        least fourteen (14) days before I plan to commence practice at that
                        location. 
                  
            (7)   Compliance and Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baillie, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                        representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Baillie, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Closing a
                  Medical Practice.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a
                  colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief
                  of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct, and may
                  result in any one or more of the following: consideration by the QAC, an
                  investigation by the College, or further action by the College, including
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baillie, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Baillie has retired from his general surgery consultation
                              practice, and has voluntarily agreed to restrict to
                              practising as a surgical assistant under the direction of a
                              qualified surgeon.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Baillie, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Qualified Surgeons and Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from
                  the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Baillie, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon and
                  any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.   

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frank George Baillie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 1, 2020:

Dr. Baillie has retired from his general surgery consultation practice, and has voluntarily agreed to restrict to practising as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon.