skip to content

Baillie, Frank George

CPSO#: 28960

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Glasgow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007
Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frank George Baillie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 1, 2020:

Dr. Baillie has retired from his general surgery consultation practice, and has voluntarily agreed to restrict to practising as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon.