skip to content

Bailie, Neil Alexander

CPSO#: 85454

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Sep 2028
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology - Head
8N-875
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163405185
Fax: 4163403327 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:03 Sep 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2028

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2021 Active
 1. Dr. NEIL ALEXANDER BAILIE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Otolaryngology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. BAILIE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BAILIE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BAILIE's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BAILIE's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 September, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 02 September, 2028.