skip to content

Bailie, Neil Alexander

CPSO#: 85454

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 2009
EXPIRY DATE
16 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Oct 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009