skip to content

Bailey, Stewart Irving

CPSO#: 25644

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stewart I. Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Site 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 4G5 Tel: 519-685-8500 ext. 55363
Date Received: 20 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016