skip to content

Bailey, Brian Clare

CPSO#: 21879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 1969
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 109
499 Sunnyside Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1S 0S8
Phone: 613-319-0419 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 600
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: 613-319-6750
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARE BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 May 2019
Summary:

 See Decision


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: February 11 & 12, 2019 Penalty hearing date: November 21, 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)