skip to content

Baigrie, Ronald Spencer

CPSO#: 22982

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronald Baigrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018
Corporation Name: Ronald Baigrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Baigrie ( CPSO# 22982 )

Business Address:
200C - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 674-5030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:11 Apr 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020