Bahreini, Zoya (CPSO#: 100877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2227 South Millway Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOYA BAHREINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHREINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018