skip to content

Bahramifarid, Nasim

CPSO#: 97898

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Persian, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans Family Health Clinic
Phone: 613-830-1771

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 Promenade de l'Aviation
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Canada
Phone: 613 742-2483
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hôpital Montfort
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nasim Bahramifarid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bahramifarid ( CPSO# 97898 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
B1060 - 801 Aviation Parkway
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Phone Number: (613) 742-2483

Business Address:
210 Centrum Blvd
Unit 101
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: 613-830-1771


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NASIM BAHRAMIFARID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRAMIFARID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014