skip to content

Bahl, Bharat

CPSO#: 95687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: 4167473691
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

NA-House Calls
355 Adelaide St. W, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5V0A8
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bharat Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bahl ( CPSO# 95687 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 826-2650

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:27 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHARAT BAHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014