skip to content

Bahat-Sternschuss, Hilla

CPSO#: 94296

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012