skip to content

Bagheri, Zarnaz

CPSO#: 98431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Sheppard Ave East, Unit # 107
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: 416-777-0004
Fax: 416-826-0009 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Z. Bagheri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Bagheri ( CPSO# 98431 )

Business Address:
107-1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 777-0004

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZARNAZ BAGHERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013