skip to content

Baeta, Basil Roderick

CPSO#: 31233

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd. Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019