skip to content

Badr, Amr Mohamed Hamed

CPSO#: 86119

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 22 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tanta University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 May 2007 to 17 Jul 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 18 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Jan 2010
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 02 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 15 Jan 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2020