skip to content

Baddar, Faisal

CPSO#: 91032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Valiant Clinic
CITY WALK, 13th Street
PO BOX 414296
Dubai 414296
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971 800 82542

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Baddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAISAL BADDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011