skip to content

Badawi, Mohamed Wael Mahmoud

CPSO#: 96985

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Azhar University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2013 to 02 Apr 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2014