skip to content

Badawi, Arieg Zein Elabdeen

CPSO#: 90469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy Of Medical Sciences & Technology, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kelso Lake Medical Centre
Unit 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 876-1011
Fax: (905) 876-3401 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Badawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Badawi ( CPSO# 90469 )

Business Address:
Kelso Lake Medical Centre
1079 Maple Avenue
Suite 2
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 876-1011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIEG ZEIN ELABDEEN BADAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011