skip to content

Badalato, Lauren Dawn

CPSO#: 95848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 7951
Fax: (613) 548-1348 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lauren Badalato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Badalato ( CPSO# 95848 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7320

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREN DAWN BADALATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALATO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017