skip to content

Babwah, Jesse Paul

CPSO#: 86123

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jesse Paul Babwah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Babwah ( CPSO# 86123 )

Business Address:
Room E4-32
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4600

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSE PAUL BABWAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABWAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013