skip to content

Babey, Kenneth Stephen

CPSO#: 29378

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kenneth S. Babey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Babey ( CPSO# 29378 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH STEPHEN BABEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977